EP2449509 - METHOD, PORTABLE DATA CARRIER, AND SYSTEM FOR ENABLING A TRANSACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANKL, Wolfgang Frauenalplweg 2b 81825 München / DE | 02 /
BALDISCHWEILER, Michael Königsseestr. 50 81825 München / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Niedermeier, Peter Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2015/01] |
Former [2012/19] | Niedermeier, Peter Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10725805.5 | 30.06.2010 | WO2010EP59274 | Priority number, date | DE20091031385 | 01.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009031385 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000864 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449509 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2449509 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G06K19/07, G06K19/10, G06K19/18 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
G06K19/07336 (EP,US);
G06K19/0717 (EP,US);
G06K19/07345 (EP,US);
G06K19/10 (EP,US);
G06K19/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | G06K19/073, G06K19/10, G06K19/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, TRAGBARER DATENTRÄGER UND SYSTEM ZUM FREIGEBEN EINER TRANSAKTION | [2012/19] | English: | METHOD, PORTABLE DATA CARRIER, AND SYSTEM FOR ENABLING A TRANSACTION | [2012/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SUPPORT DE DONNÉES PORTABLE ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE LIBÉRER UNE TRANSACTION | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Request for further processing for: | 15.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2010 | AL | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MK | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | SM | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | AT | 30.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | IE | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | LU | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PT | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
AT | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 30.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008092527 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-14* page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 13; figures 2-6 *; | [A]EP2031548 (GEMPLUS [FR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0029] - [0046] - [0052] - [0059] *; | [A]US2009065575 (PHILLIPS SIMON [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0034] , [0035] , [0068]; figure 1 *; | [A] - Czeskis, Alexei et al, "RFIDs and secret handshakes: defending against ghost-and-leech attacks and unauthorized reads with context-aware communications", Proceedings of the 15th ACM conference on Computer and communications security table of contents, Alexandria, Virginia, USA, ISBN 978-1-59593-810-7, (200810), pages 479 - 490, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1455770.1455831&coll=portal&dl=ACM&CFID=52610930&CFTOKEN=45598658, (20100819), XP002597239 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |