19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
08.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
31.07.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
23.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
21.04.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
22.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|