EP2454449 - METHODS FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF PETROLEUM FLUID AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:AL
BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:AL
BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUO, Julian Youxiang 408 Byrne Crescent, SW Edmonton Alberta T6W 1C9 / CA | 02 /
FREED, Denise 15 Rogers Street Newton Highlands Massachusetts 02461 / US | 03 /
DONG, Chengli 1327 Shady Bend Drive Sugar Land Texas 77479 / US | 04 /
POMERANTZ, Andrew E. 20 Taft Avenue Lexington Massachusetts 02421 / US | 05 /
MISHRA, Vinay K. 50 Tuscany Spring Heights, NW Calgary Alberta T3L 2X9 / CA | 06 /
MULLINS, Oliver C. 11 Hillsdale Avenue Ridgefield Connecticut 06877 / US | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/21] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10727936.6 | 01.06.2010 | [2015/36] | WO2010IB52428 | Priority number, date | US20090225014P | 13.07.2009 Original published format: US 225014 P | US20100306642P | 22.02.2010 Original published format: US 306642 P | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011007268 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454449 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454449 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/10 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
E21B49/082 (EP,US);
E21B47/10 (EP,US);
E21B49/0875 (EP,US);
E21B49/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES ERDÖLFLUIDS UND ANWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2012/21] | English: | METHODS FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF PETROLEUM FLUID AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2012/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CARACTÉRISATION DE PÉTROLE LIQUIDE ET APPLICATION ASSOCIÉE | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 04.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2010 | AL | 02.09.2015 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | IE | 01.06.2016 | LU | 01.06.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.06.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 01.06.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.06.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.06.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2445043 (SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS [VG]) [A] 1-20 * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 9 *; | [A] - MULLINS, O. ET AL, "Asphaltene Gradient in a Deepwater Oil Reservoir as Determined by Downhole Fluid Analysis", SPE 106375, (20070228), pages 1 - 6, XP002602382 [A] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph last - page 2, paragraph first * | [A] - BETANCOURT, S., ET AL., "Predicting Downhole Fluid Analysis Logs to Investigate Reservoir Connectivity", IPTC 11488, (20071204), pages 1 - 11, XP002602383 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4994671 | US2009192768 | US2009235731 | US2009248310 | - REYADH A. ALMEHAIDEB ET AL., "EOS tuning to model full field crude oil properties using multiple well fluid PVT analysis", JOURNAL OF PETROLEUM SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, (2000), vol. 26, no. 1-4, pages 291 - 300 | - REYA,DH A. ALMEHAIDEB ET AL., "EOS tuning to model full field crude oil properties using multiple well fluid PVT analysis", JOURNAL OF PETROLEUM SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, (2000), vol. 26, no. 1-4, pages 291 - 300 |