EP2262041 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Taisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5406207 / JP | 02 /
UGAJI, Masaya c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5406207 / JP | 03 /
KINOSHITA, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 5406207 / JP | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10745930.7 | 17.02.2010 | [2010/50] | WO2010JP00975 | Priority number, date | JP20090046228 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009046228 | [2010/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010098043 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2262041 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/134 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/387 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | NEGATIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT EINEM WASSERFREIEN ELEKTROLYT UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT EINEM WASSERFREIEN ELEKTROLYT | [2010/50] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2010/50] | French: | ELECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE ET BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE | [2010/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | Translation filed | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 25.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007280781 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2008103148 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2008300255 (PANASONIC CORP); | [AP]JP2009104892 (PANASONIC CORP) |