Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
17.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
02.12.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
29.09.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.09.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |