Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012518433 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010218351 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2400834 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1008726 | 08.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2719224 | 02.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102448289 | 09.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011008823 | 16.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2011138924 | 10.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG173707 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | WO2010US21950 | 25.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010098917 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010212213 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110120935 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US39241709 | 25.02.2009 |