EP2400834 - DETECTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING BED BUG INFESTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience LP 2 T.W. Alexander Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Bayer Cropscience LP Patent Department 2 T.w. Alexander Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPE, Joe, Harold III 7160 Hebron Church Road Mebane, NC 27302 / US | 02 /
POSPISCHIL, Hans, Reiner Im Tiergarten 9 50129 Bergheim Fliesteden / DE | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Bader, Axel Jochen Bayer CropScience AG Business Planning and Administration Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 Bldg. 6100 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/01] | Application number, filing date | 10746595.7 | 25.01.2010 | WO2010US21950 | Priority number, date | US20090392417 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: US 392417 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010098917 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2400834 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
A01M1/026 (EP,US);
A01M1/00 (KR);
A01M1/02 (KR);
A01M1/20 (KR);
A01M1/2027 (EP,US);
G01N33/528 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON BETTWANZENBEFALL | [2012/01] | English: | DETECTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING BED BUG INFESTATION | [2012/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE INFESTATION DE PUNAISES DES LITS | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 20.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US481270 (BAGGESEN); | [X]US1223016 (YOUNG LELAND G [US]); | [A]US1261842 (MUELLER WILHELM [US]); | [A]US3304646 (STALEY THOMAS G); | [Y]US5042194 (COHEN HAROLD L [US]); | [A]US2007044372 (LANG JASON G [US], et al); | [X]US2008148624 (BORTH PAUL W [US], et al) |