Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
12.08.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.11.2012 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 | Change - classification | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 | Change - classification | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
01.06.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
06.03.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.01.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
06.01.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
24.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.10.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.10.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.10.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |