19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
27.05.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
01.08.2015 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
17.06.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.06.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.02.2015 |
Change - inventor |
|
27.02.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
30.01.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
30.01.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
30.01.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
30.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.02.2014 |
First examination report |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.10.2013 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
22.06.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
22.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
11.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|