Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9120131 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2015 | B2 | US2012168354 | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120061974 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5863657B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013504503 | 07.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102574161B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2016 | B | CN102574161 | 11.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2477760 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2015 | B1 | EP2477760 | 25.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2772007 | 17.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2477760T | 28.09.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2546665T | 25.09.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2477760T | 31.12.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | WO2010FI50670 | 25.08.2010 | EP10765816 | 25.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011029991 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2011 | A3 | WO2011029991 | 17.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI122025B | 29.07.2011 | B | FI20095945 | 15.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE026056T | 30.05.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2477760E | 03.09.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | FI20095945 | 14.09.2009 |