EP2477760 - METHOD FOR SORTING WASTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/30] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SORTING WASTES | ||
[2015/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maricap OY Pohjantähdentie 17 01450 Vantaa / FI | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDHOLM, Göran Ilmari Kiannon kuja 3 04310 Tuusula / FI | [2015/30] |
Former [2012/30] | 01 /
SUNDHOLM, Göran Ilmari Kiannon kuja 3 FI-04310 Tuusula / FI | Representative(s) | Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Äyritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2015/30] |
Former [2012/30] | Laine, Terho Tapio, et al Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | Application number, filing date | 10765816.3 | 25.08.2010 | WO2010FI50670 | Priority number, date | FI20090005945 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: FI 20095945 | [2012/30] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011029991 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2477760 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2477760 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/34 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
B07C5/3412 (EP,FI,US);
B65F1/0006 (FI);
B03B9/00 (US);
B07C3/06 (US);
B07C3/16 (US);
B65F1/002 (EP,US);
B65F1/1484 (EP,FI,US);
G01V15/00 (FI);
G06K19/07749 (FI);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MÜLLSORTIERUNG | [2015/10] | English: | METHOD FOR SORTING WASTES | [2015/10] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE TRI DES DECHETS | [2015/14] |
Former [2012/30] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MÜLLSORTIERUNG | ||
Former [2012/30] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SORTING WASTES | ||
Former [2012/30] | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LE TRI DES DÉCHETS | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | LU | 25.08.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | BG | 22.07.2015 | |
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | BG | 22.07.2015 | |
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BG | 22.07.2015 | |
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | HR | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | HR | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | HR | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006096101 (OPTIBAG SYSTEMS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,13 * pages 2,5-8; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,15; | [I]US5100005 (NOBLE JOHN W [US], et al) [I] 1-3,13,15 * columns 1,3-; figures 1,2 *; | [I]EP1854556 (LINDE KCA DRESDEN GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-3,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0020] , [0021]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0759816 | WO03039773 | WO2005118435 | WO2006096101 |