EP2437488 - PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATAKE, Kanji c/o KYOCERA Corporation Yokohama Office 1-1 Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8502 / JP | 02 /
OKUMURA, Hajime c/o KYOCERA Corporation Yokohama Office 1-1 Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8502 / JP | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10780581.4 | 26.05.2010 | WO2010JP58931 | Priority number, date | JP20090128299 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009128299 | [2012/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010137626 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437488 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74, G03B21/00, H04M1/00, H04M1/02, H04M1/21, G06F3/01, G06F3/0346, G06F3/0485, G06F1/16 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04M1/0272 (EP,US);
G03B21/30 (US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
H04N1/3876 (US);
H04N9/3129 (EP,US);
H04N9/3147 (US);
H04N9/3173 (EP,US);
H04N9/3185 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1637 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | H04N5/74, G03B21/00, H04M1/00, H04M1/02, H04M1/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2012/14] | English: | PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2012/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTABLE | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2011 | Translation filed | 23.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 13.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1533685 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [X]JP2005338249 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [X]GB2447979 (ASHLEY KALMAN LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 21 * * page 7, line 3 - page 15, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [XP]EP2180676 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XP] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2247113 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [E] 1-4* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH10254614 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2001215610 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2002261889 (DENSO CORP); | [X]JP2005338249 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2007017177 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |