Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
05.08.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.07.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.11.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
03.04.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.08.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
08.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.03.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
30.03.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
15.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.04.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |