Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011021897 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2011 | A3 | WO2011021897 | 24.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | KR20090119336 | 03.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011021895 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2011 | A3 | WO2011021895 | 24.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011007984 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2011 | A3 | WO2011007984 | 20.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | KR20090108787 | 11.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011004985 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2011 | A3 | WO2011004985 | 13.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20090097301 | 13.10.2009 | US22336709 | 06.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US22779909 | 23.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010151081 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2011 | A3 | WO2010151081 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22555609 | 14.07.2009 | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | US22152409 | 29.06.2009 | KR20090115340 | 26.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9813986 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2016262099 | 08.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US201414533850 | 05.11.2014 | US86028710 | 20.08.2010 | US201615155922 | 16.05.2016 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US201213670226 | 06.11.2012 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9369957 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2016 | B2 | US2015055536 | 26.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US201414533850 | 05.11.2014 | US86028710 | 20.08.2010 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US201213670226 | 06.11.2012 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8897191 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2014 | B2 | US2013208640 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83373410 | 09.07.2010 | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | US201313842451 | 15.03.2013 | KR20090108787 | 11.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8908584 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2014 | B2 | US2013064156 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US86028710 | 20.08.2010 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US201213670226 | 06.11.2012 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8638705 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B2 | US2012134331 | 31.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201013380787 | 20.08.2010 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | KR20090119336 | 03.12.2009 | WO2010KR05554 | 20.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8730859 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2014 | B2 | US2012099502 | 26.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22555609 | 14.07.2009 | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | US22152409 | 29.06.2009 | WO2010KR04154 | 25.06.2010 | US201013377747 | 25.06.2010 | KR20090115340 | 26.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8325640 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2012 | B2 | US2011044220 | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US86028710 | 20.08.2010 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011019602 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | KR20090107726 | 09.11.2009 | US22290709 | 02.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US82408510 | 25.06.2010 | US24483609 | 22.09.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8422416 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2013 | B2 | US2011007681 | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83373410 | 09.07.2010 | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | KR20090108787 | 11.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8213965 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2012 | B2 | US2011003603 | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090097301 | 13.10.2009 | US83120010 | 06.07.2010 | US22336709 | 06.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US22779909 | 23.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110020151 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | KR20090119336 | 03.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110004244 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US22336709 | 06.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US22779909 | 23.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110000482 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US22555609 | 14.07.2009 | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | US22152409 | 29.06.2009 | KR20090115340 | 26.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110000479 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | US22290709 | 02.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US24483609 | 22.09.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101723411B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B1 | KR20110020150 | 02.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | US26214209 | 17.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101644150B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2016 | B1 | KR20110005760 | 19.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5539510B | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | B2 | JP2012533207 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | WO2010KR04488 | 09.07.2010 | KR20090108787 | 11.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5721708B | Global Dossier | 20.05.2015 | B2 | JP2012531799 | 10.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | KR20090107726 | 09.11.2009 | US22290709 | 02.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US24483609 | 22.09.2009 | WO2010KR04115 | 24.06.2010 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2454912 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2017 | B1 | EP2454912 | 21.01.2015 | A4 | EP2454912 | 23.05.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | WO2010KR04488 | 09.07.2010 | KR20090108787 | 11.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102804641B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2015 | B | CN102804641 | 28.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22555609 | 14.07.2009 | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | US22152409 | 29.06.2009 | WO2010KR04154 | 25.06.2010 | KR20090115340 | 26.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102804640 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | KR20090107726 | 09.11.2009 | US22290709 | 02.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US24483609 | 22.09.2009 | WO2010KR04115 | 24.06.2010 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102484855B | Global Dossier | 29.10.2014 | B | CN102484855 | 30.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090112874 | 20.11.2009 | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | WO2010KR05550 | 20.08.2010 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102474847B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B | CN102474847 | 23.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090097301 | 13.10.2009 | US22336709 | 06.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US22779909 | 23.07.2009 | WO2010KR04322 | 02.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102474817B | Global Dossier | 17.12.2014 | B | CN102474817 | 23.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22491009 | 12.07.2009 | WO2010KR04488 | 09.07.2010 | KR20090108787 | 11.11.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102474746B | Global Dossier | 10.09.2014 | B | CN102474746 | 23.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US23765809 | 27.08.2009 | US23569209 | 21.08.2009 | KR20090119336 | 03.12.2009 | WO2010KR05554 | 20.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2446556 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2014 | A4 | EP2446556 | 02.05.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | KR20090107726 | 09.11.2009 | US22290709 | 02.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US24483609 | 22.09.2009 | WO2010KR04115 | 24.06.2010 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010151063 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2011 | A3 | WO2010151063 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22058609 | 26.06.2009 | KR20090107726 | 09.11.2009 | US22290709 | 02.07.2009 | US22368109 | 07.07.2009 | US24483609 | 22.09.2009 | US24103209 | 10.09.2009 |