EP2446556 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SLEEP MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Giwon 533 Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang Gyeonggi-Do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yongho 533 Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang Gyeonggi-Do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
RYU, Kiseon 533 Hogye-Dong Dongan-Gu Anyang Gyeonggi-Do 431-080 / KR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10792345.0 | 24.06.2010 | WO2010KR04115 | Priority number, date | US20090220586P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220586 P | US20090222907P | 02.07.2009 Original published format: US 222907 P | US20090223681P | 07.07.2009 Original published format: US 223681 P | KR20090107726 | 09.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090107726 | US20090241032P | 10.09.2009 Original published format: US 241032 P | US20090244836P | 22.09.2009 Original published format: US 244836 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010151063 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446556 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04W52/02, H04W76/04 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H04W52/0235 (EP,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H04B7/26, H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR SCHLAFMODUSBETRIEB | [2012/18] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SLEEP MODE | [2012/18] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ACTIVER UN MODE VEILLE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007218939 (LIM HYOUNG-KYU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0020] - [0039] - [0061] - [0085] - [0110] - [0126]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]KR20080049958 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2010003372 (MEDIATEK INC [CN], et al) [XP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0028] - [0033] * | International search | [A]US2008182567 (ZHU HONGFEI [CN], et al); | [A]KR20080004836 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2003523696 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON); | [A]US2007296547 (PELLARIN FLORENT [FR], et al) |