EP2451398 - HIP JOINT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/20] | HIP JOINT DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
[2015/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirk Promotion LTD. Frejgatan 13, Att. 1492 114 79 Stockholm / SE | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 6 rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 12 Rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Aegeristrasse 66 6300 Zug / CH | [2015/44] |
Former [2012/20] | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Aegeristrasse 66 CH-6300 Zug / CH | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/20] | Höglund, Lars Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10797419.8 | 12.07.2010 | [2015/44] | WO2010SE50831 | Priority number, date | SE20090000981 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900981 | SE20090000957 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900957 | SE20090000959 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900959 | SE20090000960 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900960 | SE20090000962 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900962 | SE20090000963 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900963 | SE20090000965 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900965 | SE20090000966 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900966 | SE20090000968 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900968 | SE20090000969 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900969 | SE20090000970 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900970 | SE20090000972 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900972 | SE20090000973 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900973 | SE20090000974 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900974 | SE20090000976 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900976 | SE20090000978 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900978 | SE20090000958 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0900958 | US20090229738P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229738 P | US20090229739P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229739 P | US20090229743P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229743 P | US20090229745P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229745 P | US20090229746P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229746 P | US20090229747P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229747 P | US20090229748P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229748 P | US20090229751P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229751 P | US20090229752P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229752 P | US20090229755P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229755 P | US20090229761P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229761 P | US20090229767P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229767 P | US20090229778P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229778 P | US20090229786P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229786 P | US20090229789P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229789 P | US20090229796P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229796 P | US20090229735P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 229735 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005212 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451398 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451398 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/32, A61B17/16, A61F2/34, A61F2/36 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (US);
A61F2002/3241 (US);
A61F2002/3429 (US);
A61F2002/343 (US);
A61F2002/3485 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜFTGELENKVORRICHTUNG | [2015/23] | English: | HIP JOINT DEVICE | [2015/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARTICULATION DE LA HANCHE | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/20] | HÜFTGELENKVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/20] | HIP JOINT DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
Former [2012/20] | DISPOSITIF D'ARTICULATION DE LA HANCHE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 06.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15191689.7 / EP3108856 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2013 | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2014 | 31.07.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2010 | AL | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | IE | 12.07.2016 | LU | 12.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 12.07.2010 | |
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.07.2016 | ||
LU | 12.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 12.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.07.2016 | ||
LU | 12.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.07.2016 | ||
LU | 12.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.07.2016 | ||
LU | 12.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 12.07.2016 | ||
LU | 12.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 28.10.2015 | |
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 28.10.2015 | |
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US7192449 (MCQUEEN DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * columns 3-6 * [Y] 6,8-11 [I] 12-15; | [XI]EP1493406 (CT PULSE ORTHOPEDICS INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7 * paragraphs [0017] - [0035] * [I] 12-15; | [X]WO03011116 (BIOMET INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]US2002087213 (BERTRAM MORTON [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] *; | [Y]WO0209615 (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [Y] 8-11 * page 14, line 5 - page 17, line 14 * | International search | [X]US4044403 (D ERRICO JOSEPH); | [Y]US6290727 (OTTO KARL BERNAHRD [DE], et al); | [Y]US6986792 (MCLEAN TERRY [US], et al); | [A]US4978356 (NOILES DOUGLAS G [US]); | [A]EP0208578 (MOULIN, JACQUES FRANCOIS RENE) |