EP2466934 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MESSAGE TRANSMISSION CONTROL, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REGISTER/UPDATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shiwei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
FU, Tao ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WU, Qiang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Thul, Stephan Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10816646.3 | 12.08.2010 | WO2010CN75935 | Priority number, date | CN200910174697 | 17.09.2009 Original published format: CN200910174697 | [2012/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011032442 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466934 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/10, H04L29/06, H04W12/00, H04W12/12, // H04W88/08 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
H04L63/0236 (EP,US);
H04L63/0263 (EP,US);
H04W12/00 (EP,US);
H04W12/12 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | H04W8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGEN SOWIE REGISTRIERUNGS- UND AKTUALISIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MESSAGE TRANSMISSION CONTROL, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REGISTER/UPDATE | [2012/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGE, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ENREGISTREMENT/MISE À JOUR | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2012 | Translation filed | 14.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 27.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 04.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009072946 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 15; figure 1 * * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 29; figure 1 * * page 12, lines 22-32 *; | [A]US2007143422 (CAI YIGANG [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1061694 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0053] - [0057]; figure 6a * * paragraphs [0065] - [0070] * | International search | [Y]WO2008112482 (CISCO TECH INC [US], et al); | [Y]CN1794761 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]CN101335788 (SHANGHAI LIANGJIANG COMM SYSTE [CN]) |