EP2502928 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION, COSMETIC COMPOSITION OR FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION PRODUCED BY THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kewpie Kabushiki Kaisha (also Trading As Kewpie Corporation) 4-13 Shibuya 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | [2017/45] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Kewpie Kabushiki Kaisha (also Trading As Kewpie Corporation) 4-13 Shibuya 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA Ae c/o Kewpie Corporation R&D Division 13-1, Sumiyoshi-cho 5-chome Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-0034 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA Hideto c/o Kewpie Corporation R&D Division 13-1, Sumiyoshi-cho 5-chome Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-0034 / JP | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | Ritthaler, Wolfgang Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | KATZAROV S.A. European Patent Attorneys 19, rue des Epinettes 1227 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 10831394.1 | 24.09.2010 | [2017/45] | WO2010JP66511 | Priority number, date | JP20090264907 | 20.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009264907 | [2012/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011061995 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2502928 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2502928 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/10, A23L33/12, A23D7/01, A23L2/52, A23J7/00, A61K8/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/98, C07F9/10, A61K9/127, A61K8/55 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
A61K8/982 (EP);
C07F9/10 (EP,KR);
A23D7/011 (EP);
A23J7/00 (EP,KR);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/10 (EP);
A23L33/12 (EP);
A61K8/55 (KR);
A61K8/553 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | C07F9/10, A23J7/00, A23L1/30, A61K8/55, A61K8/92, A61K8/98, A61K9/10, A61K9/127, A61K47/44, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GEREINIGTEN EIGELB-PHOSPHOLIPID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ODER LEBENSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT DER IN DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTEN EIGELB-PHOSPHOLIPID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2012/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION, COSMETIC COMPOSITION OR FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING PURIFIED EGG-YOLK PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITION PRODUCED BY THE PROCESS | [2012/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' OEUF PURIFIÉ, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE, COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE OU COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' OEUF PURIFIÉ OBTENUE PAR LE PROCÉDÉ | [2017/20] |
Former [2012/39] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' UF PURIFIÉ, ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE, COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE OU COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE DE JAUNE D' UF PURIFIÉ OBTENUE PAR LE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2012 | Translation filed | 20.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 31.12.2012 | Observations by third parties | 07.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2010 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004014144 (SOLAE LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, lines 2-7,20-33 * * page 4, lines 1-20 * * page 5, lines 25-30,33-34 * * page 6, lines 29-31 * * claim 7 *; | [A]WO0000038 (MICHAEL FOODS INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - "Zardi-e- Baiz Neem Brist", TKDL,, (18960101), XP003029296 [X] 7,9 * the whole document * | [X] - "Nuskha Bara--e Jhaeen Wa Kalaf", TKDL,, (19110101), XP003029297 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * | [X] - "Tila Baiza Biryan", TKDL,, (18960101), XP003029298 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * | [X] - "Matbookh Zardi-e- Baiz", TKDL,, (18960101), XP003029299 [X] 7,9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005272380 (Q P CORP); | [A]JPH09224584 (Q P CORP); | [A]JPH09167 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JPS6239593 | JP2005272380 | - Science of Egg (Tamago-no-kagaku, ASAKURA PUBLISHING CO., LTD | other | - "Zardi-e- Baiz Neem Brist", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/619A, XP003029296 | - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, pages 399 - 400 | - "Nuskha Bara-e Jhaeen Wa Kalaf", TKDL, Database accession no. NA2/214W, XP003029297 | - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. I, page 617 | - "Tila-e- Baiza Bara-e- Kalf", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/619A3, XP003029298 | - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 400 | - "Matbookh Zardi-e- Baiz", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/619D, XP003029299 |