03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
07.06.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
31.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
27.07.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
29.06.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
23.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
05.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2017 |
First examination report |
|
06.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
22.02.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
14.12.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
17.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
28.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
31.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|