Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8805290 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2012309323 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010CN73908 | 12.06.2010 | CN201010109491 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2521282 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B1 | EP2521282 | 18.12.2013 | A4 | EP2521282 | 07.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010CN73908 | 12.06.2010 | CN201010109491 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011097854 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201010109491 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102158873 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201010109491 | 12.02.2010 |