06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
10.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
23.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
15.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
09.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.12.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
30.11.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
20.06.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
13.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
06.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.06.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
19.04.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.11.2015 |
First examination report |
|
05.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
22.02.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |