08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
25.09.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
18.10.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
09.10.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
29.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.05.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
04.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
04.06.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
14.03.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.12.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
23.12.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
23.12.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
23.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |