Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8627746 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2014 | B2 | US2012002909 | 05.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010015724 | 21.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2381129 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2019 | B1 | EP2381129 | 25.01.2012 | A3 | EP2381129 | 26.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102010015724 | 21.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010015724 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010015724 | 21.04.2010 |