29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
19.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
21.11.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
13.12.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
18.01.2013 |
Change - English title |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
18.01.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
17.12.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.11.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2012 |
First examination report |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
16.03.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.03.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
23.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
07.10.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |