Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015230962 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514701089 | 30.04.2015 | WO2009DE00734 | 20.05.2009 | US99379810 | 19.11.2010 | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9022965 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2015 | B2 | US2011071452 | 24.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE00734 | 20.05.2009 | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2276433 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2011 | B1 | EP2276433 | 26.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE00734 | 20.05.2009 | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2380529 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2014 | B1 | EP2380529 | 26.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09749498 | 20.05.2009 | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE534355T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009DE00734 | 20.05.2009 | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009140956 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2010 | A3 | WO2009140956 | 26.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008024748 | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008024748 | 20.05.2008 | Type | Earlier application | EP2276433 |