EP2380529 - Method for operating a knee orthotic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/43] | Knee orthotic and method for operating same | ||
[2013/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Bock HealthCare GmbH Max-Näder-Strasse 15 37115 Duderstadt / DE | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auberger, Roland Spallartgasse 9/35 1140 Wien / AT | 02 /
James, Kelvin B. 9627 - 83 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6C 3A3 / CA | [2012/14] |
Former [2011/45] | 01 /
Auberger, Roland Fugbachgasse 9/17 1020 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
James, Kelly B. 9627 - 83 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6C 3A3 / CA | Representative(s) | Stornebel, Kai, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Stornebel, Kai, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004660.4 | 20.05.2009 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | DE20081024748 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008024748 | [2011/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380529 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2380529 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
A61F5/0123 (EP,US);
A61F5/0111 (EP,US);
A61F5/0125 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0188 (US);
A61F2005/0197 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern einer Knieorthese | [2013/08] | English: | Method for operating a knee orthotic | [2013/08] | French: | Procédé de commande d'une orthèse de genou | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/43] | Knieorthese sowie Verfahren zum Steuern einer Knieorthese | ||
Former [2011/43] | Knee orthotic and method for operating same | ||
Former [2011/43] | Orthèse de genou et procédé de commande d'une orthèse de genou | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09749498.3 / EP2276433 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2009 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | AT | 20.05.2014 | GB | 20.05.2014 | IE | 20.05.2014 | LU | 20.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.05.2009 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.05.2009 | |
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3911780 (HESSABI IRADJ [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]US5252102 (SINGER ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 14 * [Y] 7; | [A]US5547464 (LUTTRELL TAMMY C [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XD]WO0143669 (RESPECTA OY [FI], et al) [XD] 1-3,13,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6377178 (DETORO WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE29914375U | DE20217355U | DE60015384T | DE60122483T | DE102006012716 |