Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9393214 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2016 | B2 | US2014294981 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP04042 | 26.09.2012 | EP11008085 | 06.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013050115 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11008085 | 06.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2578539 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B1 | EP2578539 | 10.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11008085 | 06.10.2011 |