13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
01.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
25.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
11.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
05.04.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
06.03.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
21.02.2015 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.02.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.10.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.09.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2014 |
First examination report |
|
21.05.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2014 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
12.02.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
12.02.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
04.10.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.04.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.01.2013 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
18.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.10.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
17.02.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
17.02.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
10.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
16.12.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |