Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2357061 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | B1 | EP2357061 | 30.03.2016 | A3 | EP2357061 | 17.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1051033 | 15.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2956340 | 02.03.2012 | B1 | FR2956340 | 19.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1051033 | 15.02.2010 |