EP2363363 - Method and device for reversing the direction of transport of objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Armin Am See 27 78465 Konstanz / DE | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/36] | Application number, filing date | 11155993.6 | 25.02.2011 | [2011/36] | Priority number, date | DE20101010375 | 05.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010010375 | [2011/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2363363 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2363363 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/12, B65H15/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B65H29/12 (EP,US);
B65H2301/33314 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4452 (EP,US);
B65H2511/11 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/11, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/36] | B65H29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Richtungsumkehr beim Transport von Gegenständen | [2011/36] | English: | Method and device for reversing the direction of transport of objects | [2011/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'inversion de sens lors du transport d'objets | [2011/36] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2013 | 28.02.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5449166 (LOHMANN BORIS [DE], et al) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 36 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 2 * * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1529747 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0037] ** the whole document *; | [AD]EP1754675 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * claims 1-4, 6,7,10,11 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US5449166 | EP1424299 | EP1529747 | DE102004012378 | DE102004026362 | EP1834910 | DE102006027872 | EP1754675 |