EP2357811 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Hideyuki c/o Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | 02 /
Sunaga, Tadaharu c/o Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shinya c/o Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | [2015/18] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
Sawada, Hideyuki c/o Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | ||
02 /
Sunaga, Tadaharu c/o Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Shinya c/o Onkyo Corporation 2-1, Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-8540 / JP | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/36] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstrasse 65 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Patentship Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Elsenheimerstrasse 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11165046.1 | 16.03.2009 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | JP20080163427 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008163427 | JP20080173928 | 02.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008173928 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357811 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2357811 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/765, G09G5/00 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N21/44 (EP,US);
H04N21/440272 (EP,US);
H04N21/4854 (EP,US);
H04N5/57 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2011/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2011/33] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [2011/33] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images | [2011/33] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09155192.9 / EP2139234 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090155192) is 06.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2009 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | NL | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.03.2009 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.03.2009 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 29.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007220150 (GARG GOPAL K [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013]; figures 5A, 5B *; | [A]US2007137988 (YU TSE-CHING J [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0039]; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2007158903 (SHARP KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2008131096 (MAGARA SHO [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0039]; figure 3 * |