10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
04.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.05.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
09.06.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.05.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
18.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
14.06.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
23.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.11.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
02.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
02.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
21.12.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |