Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2397620 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2017 | B1 | EP2397620 | 05.12.2012 | A3 | EP2397620 | 21.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI20105688 | 15.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI20105688 | 16.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | FI20105688 | 15.06.2010 |