EP2397620 - Laminated beam construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paroc Group Oy Energiakuja 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | For all designated states Woodpolis Puusepänkatu 3 88900 Kuhmo / FI | For all designated states Oy Timber Frame Ltd Kutomokuja 2 A 4 30110 Forssa / FI | [2015/47] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Paroc Oy Ab Läkkisepäntie 23 00621 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states Woodpolis Puusepänkatu 3 88900 Kuhmo / FI | |||
For all designated states Oy Timber Frame Ltd Kutomokuja 2 A 4 30110 Forssa / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heino, Kyösti Laitakatu 5 87500 Kajaani / FI | 02 /
Sevon, Jukka Brobackavägen 4 A 2 21600 Pargas / FI | 03 /
Steenroos, Matti Soitinkorpi 1 B 13430 Hämeenlinna / FI | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2017/28] |
Former [2011/51] | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 11168069.0 | 30.05.2011 | [2011/51] | Priority number, date | FI20100005688 | 15.06.2010 Original published format: FI 20105688 | [2011/51] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2397620 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2397620 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2397620 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04C3/14, E04C3/29, E04C1/40, E04C2/24, E04B2/70 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
E04C3/14 (EP,FI);
E04C2/243 (EP,FI);
E04B2/702 (EP,FI);
E04C1/40 (EP,FI);
E04C3/122 (EP,FI);
E04C3/29 (EP,FI);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2011/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lamellierte Balkenkonstruktion | [2011/51] | English: | Laminated beam construction | [2011/51] | French: | Construction de poutre en lamellé-collé | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 05.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2011 | AL | 12.07.2017 | AT | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | ES | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | IT | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | NL | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.05.2011 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.05.2011 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH692993 (FRINORM AG [LI]) [Y] 1-6 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 9; figure 7 * * column 3, lines 24-37 *; | [Y]GB1596780 (ROCKWOOL INT) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, lines 6-13; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]EP2141303 (KNAUF INSULATION GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]GB2302346 (ROCKWOOL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-6 * page 3, lines 20-23 * * page 5, lines 24-31 *; | [Y]DE2309878 (BAU FRITZ INH JOHANN FRITZ FA [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1-8; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE29923387U (JASPERS HELMUT [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [A]DE2650915 (IHLEFELD KARL HELMUT) [A] 1-6 * page 6; figures 1-2 *; | [A]WO03008724 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 6, lines 3-9; figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | SE457456 | SE303580 |