EP2460530 - Human growth hormone crystals and methods for preparing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Althea Technologies, Inc. 11040 Roselle Street San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Govardhan, Chandrika 9 Scotland Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 02 /
Khalaf, Nazer 14 Lauf Street Worcester, MA 01602 / US | 03 /
Simeone, Benjamin Paul 1798 Massachusetts Avenue Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11168985.7 | 31.12.2003 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | US20020437519P | 31.12.2002 Original published format: US 437519 P | US20030517042P | 03.11.2003 Original published format: US 517042 P | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2460530 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2460530 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/27, C07K14/61 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/27 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kristalle des menschlichen Wachstumshormons und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2012/23] | English: | Human growth hormone crystals and methods for preparing them | [2012/23] | French: | Cristaux d'hormone de croissance humaine et leurs procédés de préparation | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03808602.1 / EP1581251 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030808602) is 29.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1073421 (ALTUS BIOLOGICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14,18 * claims 38-43 *; | [X]WO02053174 (PBL BIOMEDICAL LAB [US], et al) [X] 15-17 * claims 3, 12-14 * | [A] - JEN A ET AL, "Diamonds in the rough: Protein crystals from a formulation perspective", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20011101), vol. 18, no. 11, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1483 - 1488, XP002307178 [A] 1-14,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1013057825942 | [X] - CLELAND J L ET AL, "STABLE FORMULATIONS OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN GROWTH HORMONE AND INTERFERON-GAMMA FOR MICROENCAPSULATION IN BIODEGRADABLE MICROSPHERES", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960101), vol. 13, no. 10, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1464 - 1475, XP001084606 [X] 1-14,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1016063109373 | [T] - GOVARDHAN CHANDRIKA ET AL, "Novel long-acting crystal formulation of human growth hormone", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH (DORDRECHT), (200509), vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1461 - 1470, XP002509313 [T] 1-14,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-05-6021-x | [A] - TAI I T ET AL, "MICROENCAPSULATION OF RECOMBINANT CELLS: A NEW DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR GENE THERAPY", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, US, (19930101), vol. 7, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 1061 - 1069, XP002016275 [A] 1-14,18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5981485 | US6448225 | US5780599 | US6117984 | US4342832 | US5633352 | - MAURAS ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (2000), vol. 85, no. 10, pages 3653 - 3660 | - FRINDIK ET AL., HORMONE RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 15 - 19 | - LEGER ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1998), vol. 83, no. 10, pages 3512 - 3516 | - BRAMSWIG, ENDOCRINE, (2001), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 5 - 13 | - PASQUINO ET AL., HORMONE RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 46, no. 6, pages 269 - 272 | - CARROLL ET AL., TRENDS IN ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (2000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 231 - 238 | - UELAND ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (2002), vol. 87, no. 6, pages 2760 - 2763 | - SIMPSON ET AL., GROWTH HORMONE & IGF RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 12, pages 1 - 33 | - MEHLS, HAAS, GROWTH HORMONE & IGF RESEARCH, (2000), pages S31 - S37 | - FINE ET AL., J. PEDIATRICS, (2000), vol. 136, no. 3, pages 376 - 382 | - MOTOYAMA ET AL., CLIN. EXP. NEPHROLOGY, (1998), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 162 - 165 | - HIRSCHFELD, HORMONE RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 46, pages 215 - 221 | - TRITOS ET AL., AM. J. MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 105, no. 1, pages 44 - 57 | - MULLIGAN ET AL., J. PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION, (1999), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 5202 - S209 | - TORRES, CADMAN, BIODRUGS, (2000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 83 - 91 | - RITZEN, HORMONE RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 56, no. 5-6, page 208 | - EIHOLZER ET AL., EUR. J. PEDIATRICS, (1998), vol. 157, no. 5, pages 368 - 377 | - ROSS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, no. 36, pages 21696 - 21977 | - KATAKAM ET AL., J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1997), vol. 49, no. 1, pages 21 - 26 | - HERBERGER ET AL., PROC. INTL. SYMP. CONTROLLED RELEASE OF BIOACTIVE MATERIALS, (1996), vol. 23, pages 835 - 836 | - KIM ET AL., INTL. J. PHARMACEUTICS, (2001), vol. 229, no. 1-2, pages 107 - 116 | - HARO ET AL., J. CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (1998), vol. 720, pages 39 - 47 | - BENNANI-BAITI ET AL., GENOMICS, (1995), vol. 29, pages 647 - 652 | - WU ET AL., J. CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1990), vol. 500, pages 595 - 606 |