Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
20.05.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.02.2015 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.02.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.10.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.01.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.09.2013 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
15.04.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.04.2013 | First examination report | |
08.03.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
05.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.01.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.07.2012 | Publication of search report | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 | Change - classification | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 | Change - classification | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
05.06.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
03.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |