EP2402818 - Photosensitive composition, pattern forming material, and photosensitive film, pattern forming method, pattern film, low refractive index film, optical device and solid-state imaging device each using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saie, Toshiyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Wada, Kenji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Makino, Masaomi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Tomeba, Hisamitsu c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 05 /
Yoshibayashi, Mitsuji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172113.0 | 30.06.2011 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | JP20100150640 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010150640 | JP20100223268 | 30.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010223268 | JP20100294339 | 28.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010294339 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2402818 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/09 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G03F7/091 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/0047 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/033 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0382 (KR);
H01L27/14 (KR);
H01L2924/00 (KR);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/3025, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung, Mustererzeugungsmaterial und lichtempfindlicher Film, Mustererzeugungsverfahren, Musterfilm, Film mit niedrigem Brechungsindex, sowie optische Vorrichtung und Festkörperbildgebungsvorrichtung damit | [2012/01] | English: | Photosensitive composition, pattern forming material, and photosensitive film, pattern forming method, pattern film, low refractive index film, optical device and solid-state imaging device each using the same | [2012/01] | French: | Composition photosensible, matériau formant des motifs et film photosensible, procédé de formation de motifs, film à motifs, film à faible indice de réfraction, dispositif optique et dispositif d'imagerie à l'état solide l'ultilisant | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004012317 (OBAYASHI TATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0060]; compounds P-3 *; | [X]EP1731325 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-10,13-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0088] , [0089] *; | [X]EP2042892 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0255] , [0256] *; | [X]US2009233227 (HAUCK GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-16 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 53] , [0177] - [0179]; examples 2,3; claims 14-17; table I to III *; | [X]EP2168766 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0039] , [0343] , [0353] , [ 383] - [0388] - [ 407] - [0409]; example all; claims 1-3; tables 1-6 * | by applicant | JPS5425957B | US3615455 | JPS4864183 | JPS4841708B | JPS494319B | JPS4917040 | JPS506034B | GB1388492 | JPS50151996 | JPS50151997 | JPS50158680 | JPS50158698 | JPS5137193 | JPS5230899 | JPS5230490B | JPS53133428 | US4139655 | JPS5434327B | US4212976 | JPS55125105 | JPS568428 | JPS5655420 | JPS56149402 | JPS571819B | JPS576096B | JPS57192429 | JPS5812577B | JPS5944615 | JPS5953836 | JPS5971048 | JPS6258241 | JPS63287944 | JPS63287947 | JPH01271741 | JPH0519475 | JPH0534920 | JPH05281728 | JPH06348011 | JPH0712004B | JPH07128785 | JPH07128867 | JPH07140589 | JPH07146562 | JPH07271028 | JPH07292014 | JPH07306527 | JPH07120041B | JPH07120042B | JPH0812424B | JPH08278637 | JP2764769B | JPH10291969 | JPH11352691 | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | EP0993966 | JP2000187322 | JP2000273370 | JP2001233611 | JP2001233842 | JP2001242612 | JP2001318463 | JP2002062698 | JP2002107918 | JP2002116539 | EP1204000 | JP2002309057 | JP2002311569 | JP2002363206 | JP2002363207 | JP2002363208 | JP2002363209 | JP2003226516 | JP2003238140 | JP2003262958 | JP2003327424 | JP2003335515 | JP2004534797 | JP3718031B | JP2006029119 | JP2006085140 | JP2006342166 | JP2007002101 | JP2007002102 | JP2007231000 | JP2007269779 | JP2007281523 | JP2007322744 | JP2008243945 | JP2008292970 | JP4225898B | JP2009134098 | JP2009191061 | JP2009288705 | JP2010031222 | JP2010032996 | - WAKABAYASHI ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1969), vol. 42, page 2924 | - F.C. SCHAEFER ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1964), vol. 29, page 1527 | - KUNZ, MARTIN ET AL., RAD TECH' 98, PROCEEDING, (199804), pages 19 - 22 | - J. C. S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 1653 - 1660 | - J. C. S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 156 - 162 | - JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLVMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGV, (1995), pages 202 - 232 | - VO YUKI ZAIRVO, Organic Materials for Imaging, JOEM, (1993), pages 187 - 192 | - THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1998), vol. 71, no. 11 |