EP2540779 - Item produced through thermoforming or injection moulding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2013/01] | Application number, filing date | 11172188.2 | 30.06.2011 | [2013/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2540779 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C08L67/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08K3/013, C08L67/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Durch Thermoformen oder Spritzguss hergestellter Artikel | [2013/01] | English: | Item produced through thermoforming or injection moulding | [2013/01] | French: | Article fabriqué par thermoformage ou moulage par injection | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2013/24] | 28.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19857067 (YKK CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * example 2 * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2010034711 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claim - * * example - * * page 10, lines 1,2 * | by applicant | US6573340 | WO2005063883 | WO2010034711 | WO9615173 | EP0488617 | - LITERATUR: POLYM. DEGR. STAB., (2004), vol. 85, pages 855 - 863 | WO2008EP06714 |