Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
30.08.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.08.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.01.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |