Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
02.04.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2014 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
19.09.2014 | Change - classification | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 | Change - classification | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
14.07.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.09.2012 | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.08.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.07.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
25.01.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |