EP2410107 - Tent structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LP TENT Sarl 81-83, rue du Morellon 38070 Saint-Quentin-Fallavier / FR | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robba, Carlo LP TENT Sarl B.P. 4 69720 St Laurent de Mure / FR | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Jeannet, Olivier JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 11173622.9 | 12.07.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | FR20100055865 | 19.07.2010 Original published format: FR 1055865 | [2012/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2410107 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/18, E04H15/64 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
E04H15/18 (EP);
E04H15/64 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | E04H15/18, E04H15/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zeltstruktur | [2012/04] | English: | Tent structure | [2012/04] | French: | Structure de tente | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202004012558U (KONDOGTIS PANAGIOTIS [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]US2007062567 (WARNER GERY [CA]) [A] 1-4 * figure 15 *; | [A]DE202005019495U (ELFLEIN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE202004012558U | US2007062567 | DE202005019495U | FR703810 |