EP2428944 - Driving management system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senart, Aline 70 Chemin Monte-Cala 06620 Le Bar sur Loup / FR | 02 /
Mesnage, Marion 15 Avenue Muterse 06600 ANTIBES / FR | 03 /
Kurth, Scott W. 430 South Evergreen Avenue ARLINGTON HEIGHTS, IL Illinois 60005 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2012/11] | Application number, filing date | 11180061.1 | 05.09.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | US20100879707 | 10.09.2010 Original published format: US 879707 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2428944 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/123, G01F9/00, G07C5/00, G08G1/0962 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G07C5/008 (EP,US);
G08G1/0962 (EP,US);
G08G1/205 (EP,US);
G07C9/00563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ansteuerungsverwaltungssystem und Verfahren | [2012/11] | English: | Driving management system and method | [2012/11] | French: | Système et procédé de gestion de conduite | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008107514 (EC TOOLS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-17 * page 9, line 25 - page 21, line 3; figures 1-7 * [I] 3; | [XI]WO2007138744 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-17 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,10; | [A]US2007143002 (CROWELL THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1507245 (MIYAMA INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2929027 (SOFIDE SOC EN COMMANDITE PAR A [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |