Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
20.01.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.11.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |