EP2607880 - Method of producing an extract of a smokeless tobacco product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diekmann, Joerg Koenigsbergerstrasse 44 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Nett, Tanja Adolf-Friedrich-Strasse 15 53840 Troisdorf / DE | 03 /
Ottmueller, Thomas Fauststrasse 28 51145 Cologne / DE | 04 /
Wittke, Sandra Ketzberg 106 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 05 /
Zenzen, Volker Fliederweg 104 51143 Cologne / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Gillian Claire Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Taylor, Gillian Claire Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11195038.2 | 21.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607880 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, A24B15/24, A24B15/26 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A24B15/24 (EP);
G01N1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Extrakts eines rauchlosen Tabakprodukts | [2013/26] | English: | Method of producing an extract of a smokeless tobacco product | [2013/26] | French: | Procédé de production d'un extrait de produit de tabac sans fumée | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07103869 (NORIN SUISANSYO NOGYO KENKYU C) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0017] - [0025] *; | [A]US5435941 (VON FRAUNHOFER JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 17 * * column 7, line 1 - line 15 * | [IY] - CHIN C. CHOU ET AL, "Bioassay-driven analysis of chewing tobacco extracts", ENVIRONMENTAL TOXICOLOGY AND CHEMISTRY, (19940701), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 1177 - 1186, XP002676256 [I] 1,4-9,12-15 * abstract * * page 1177, column 1, line 1 - page 1178, column 2, line 22 * [Y] 2,3,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/etc.5620130719 | [Y] - RICKERT W S ET AL, "Chemical and toxicological characterization of commercial smokeless tobacco products available on the Canadian market", REGULATORY TOXICOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 53, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YRTPH.2008.12.004, ISSN 0273-2300, (20090301), pages 121 - 133, (20090214), XP025948063 [Y] 2,3,10,11 * abstract * * page 123, column 2, line 10 - page 124, column 1, line 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yrtph.2008.12.004 | by applicant | - "Bacterial Reverse Mutation Test", OECD GUIDELINE, (1997), page 471 | - MARON, D.M.; AMES, B. N., "Revised methods for the Salmonella mutagenicity test", MUTAT. RES., (1983), vol. 113, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-1161(83)90010-9, pages 173 - 215, XP023455372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-1161(83)90010-9 | - KADO, N.Y.; LANGLEY, D.; EISENSTADT, E, "A simple modification of the Salmonella liquid incubation assay: increased sensibility for detecting mutagens in human urine", MUTAT. RES., (1983), vol. 121, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-7992(83)90082-9, pages 25 - 32, XP023591472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-7992(83)90082-9 |