EP2539387 - VINYL-CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reichhold LLC 2 P.O. Box 13582 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3583 / US | [2019/18] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Reichhold, Inc. P.O. Box 13582 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAVA, Hildeberto 210 Ashley Brook Court Cary North Carolina 27513 / US | 02 /
LIU, Yongning 2212 Lilyford Lane Apex North Carolina 27502 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Gibbs, Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Gibbs, Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2013/01] | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11707248.8 | 16.02.2011 | [2019/23] | WO2011US24970 | Priority number, date | US201113024547 | 10.02.2011 Original published format: US201113024547 | US20100307489P | 24.02.2010 Original published format: US 307489 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/01] | US20110024547 | 10.02.2011 | |
US20100307489P | 24.02.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011106212 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539387 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2539387 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/47, C08G63/91, C09D167/07 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
C08G63/47 (EP,US);
C07D301/00 (US);
C07C67/08 (US);
C07C67/30 (US);
C08G63/914 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VINYLHALTIGE VERBINDUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/01] | English: | VINYL-CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2013/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS CONTENANT DU VINYLE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Request for further processing for: | 19.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2011 | AL | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | IE | 16.02.2020 | LU | 16.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.02.2011 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 05.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0054105 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 12 - page 6, line 10; examples A,B,C, 1-6; claim 1; tables 1,2 *; | [A]EP0126341 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 33 - page 6, line 14; examples 2, 3, 5-7; claims 1, 9; tables 1, 2 *; | [A]US6107362 (KOENIGER RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* column 1, line 37 - column 4, line 51 *; | [XDY]US6153788 (FISCHER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-8 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 46; example 2 * [Y] 9,10; | [YD]US2009076218 (ZHAO MING YANG [US], et al) [YD] 9,10 * example 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3367992 | US4546142 | US5096938 | US5118783 | US5373058 | US5393830 | US5492668 | US5501830 | US5747607 | US5821383 | US5874503 | US6063957 | US6107446 | US6150458 | US6153788 | US6268467 | US6458991 | US6468662 | US2004068088 | US2004076830 | US2007179250 | US2009022998 | US2009076218 |