|
05.02.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
21.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
11 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |