Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013244047 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP60369 | 21.06.2011 | EP10177164 | 16.09.2010 | EP10167039 | 23.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5824777B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2015 | B2 | JP2013536265 | 19.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP60369 | 21.06.2011 | EP10177164 | 16.09.2010 | EP10167039 | 23.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102947391 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP60369 | 21.06.2011 | EP10177164 | 16.09.2010 | EP10167039 | 23.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2585538 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP60369 | 21.06.2011 | EP10177164 | 16.09.2010 | EP11726454 | 21.06.2011 | EP10167039 | 23.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012033069 | 20.12.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP60369 | 21.06.2011 | EP10177164 | 16.09.2010 | EP10167039 | 23.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011161115 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10177164 | 16.09.2010 | EP10167039 | 23.06.2010 |