EP2585538 - FILM OR PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROEKS, Alexander Antonius Marie Postbus 4 NL-6100 AA Echt / NL | 02 /
TOMIC, Katarina Postbus 4 NL-6100 AA Echt / NL | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Derix, Nocky Marienna, et al DSM Intellectual Property Urmond Office P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 11726454.9 | 21.06.2011 | WO2011EP60369 | Priority number, date | EP20100177164 | 16.09.2010 Original published format: EP 10177164 | EP20100167039 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10167039 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011161115 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2585538 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/06, C08J5/18, B32B27/34, C08L77/02, H01L31/048, H05K1/03 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
H01L31/0481 (EP,US);
H05K1/0353 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2439/00 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
B32B2457/08 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
C08J2377/02 (EP,US);
C08J2377/06 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/02, C08L77/06 (US,EP);
C08L77/06, C08L77/02 (US,EP);
C08L77/06, C08L77/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | FILM ODER PLATTE | [2013/18] | English: | FILM OR PLATE | [2013/18] | French: | PELLICULE OU PLAQUE | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 29.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2431783 (WAY WATKINS WILLIAM) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 22 * * column 5, line 21 - line 28 * * example - * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0323671 (STAMICARBON [NL]) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 1 * * page 2, line 29 - line 45 * * table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [XYI]WO0009586 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,8,11 * page 1, line 8 - line 12 * * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 6 - page 5, line 15 * * page 6, line 13 - line 23 * * example I * * claims 1,5-7,9,10,12 * [Y] 9,10 [I] 2; | [Y]EP2043162 (ASAHI FIBREGLASS CO [JP]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * example - * * claims 1,4,5 *; | [XYI]WO2010004199 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 5, line 13 - line 18 * * page 7, line 9 - line 25 * * page 12, line 1 - line 7 * * page 13, line 1 - line 13 * * example - * * claims 1,3,4,6-11,14,15 * [Y] 9,10 [I] 2-7; | [XP]WO2011033035 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-3,6-8,11 * page 1, line 3 - line 4 * * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 6 * * example - ** claims 1,10,11 *; | [X] - COR KONING, LILIAN TEUWEN, "Polyamides 4.10 and 4.12: Potentially New Engineering Plastics", ANTEC 2000 - 58TH ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE OF THE SOCIETY OF PLASTICS ENGINEERS, BROOKFIELD, CT, US, (20000507), vol. 2, ISSN 0272-5223, pages 1562 - 1567, XP009129395 [X] 1 * page 1562, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 1562, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 1563, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 1565, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 2 * * tables 1-4 * | by applicant | - Nylon Plastics Handbook, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (1995), page 5 |