EP2529011 - MICROORGANISMS AND METHODS FOR THE BIOSYNTHESIS OF P-TOLUATE AND TEREPHTHALATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/52] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 10520 Wateridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERHOUT, Robin, E. 10520 Wateridge Circle San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 11737470.2 | 21.01.2011 | WO2011US22046 | Priority number, date | US20100299794P | 29.01.2010 Original published format: US 299794 P | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011094131 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2529011 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/1022 (EP,US);
C12N9/1085 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12P7/24 (US);
C12P7/40 (EP,KR,US);
C12P7/44 (EP,US);
C12P7/62 (US);
C12P9/00 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01267 (EP,US);
C12Y401/03 (EP,US);
C12Y402/01 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01025 (EP,US);
C12Y202/01007 (EP,US);
C12Y205/01019 (EP,US);
C12Y205/01054 (EP,US);
C12Y207/01071 (EP,US);
C12Y401/0304 (EP,US);
C12Y402/0101 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | MIKROORGANISMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BIOSYNTHESE VON P-TOLUAT UND TEREPHTHALAT | [2012/49] | English: | MICROORGANISMS AND METHODS FOR THE BIOSYNTHESIS OF P-TOLUATE AND TEREPHTHALATE | [2012/49] | French: | MICRO-ORGANISMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA BIOSYNTHÈSE DE P-TOLUATE ET TÉRÉPHTALATE | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 13.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009191593 (BURK MARK J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * Whole doc., in particular hydrogenase aspect (e.g. para. [0047]), but combines with Wood-Ljungdahl pathway (e.g. para. [0028]) *; | [XP]WO2010132845 (GENOMATICA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-4 * p.72, l.19- p.73, l.4 *; | [XP]WO2010144746 (GENOMATICA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-4 * p.51, l.22- p.52, l.9 *; | [IY] - YAMAMOTO MASAHIRO ET AL, "Role of two 2-oxoglutarate:ferredoxin oxidoreductases in Hydrogenobacter thermophilus under aerobic and anaerobic conditions.", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS OCT 2006, (200610), vol. 263, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 189 - 193, XP002734013 [I] 1-4 * Whole document, in particular non-natural variants of TK-6; rTCA + NiFe hydrogenase (e.g. non-cited: Biosci Biotechnol Biochem. 2000 Mar;64(3):492-502) are naturally present in TK-6 * [Y] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-6968.2006.00415.x | [T] - RASHMI SAINI ET AL, "CO-utilizing microbes. A comprehensive review.", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, vol. 29, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BIOTECHADV.2011.08.009, ISSN 0734-9750, (20110805), pages 949 - 960, (20110812), XP028306429 [T] * Whole doc., in particular section 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2011.08.009 | International search | [A]US2008274522 (BRAMUCCI MICHAEL G [US], et al); | [A]US2009155873 (KASHIYAMA YUKI [US], et al); | [A]US2009239275 (DONALDSON GAIL K [US], et al); | [A]US2009280546 (LAROSSA ROBERT A [US]); | [X] - TOBIMATSU ET AL., "Molecular cloning, sequencing, and expression of the genes encoding adenosylcobalamin-dependent diol dehydrase of Klebsiella oxytoca.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, no. 13, pages 7142 - 7148, XP002062740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.13.7142 | [Y] - CHA ET AL., "Escherichia coli periplasmic thiol peroxidase acts as lipid hydroperoxide peroxidase and the principal antioxidative function during anaerobic growth.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 10, pages 8769 - 8778, XP008159653 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M312388200 | [A] - SEYFRIED ET AL., "Cloning, sequencing, and overexpression of the genes encoding coenzyme B12-dependent glycerol dehydratase of Citrobacter freundii.", J. BACTERIOL., (1996), vol. 178, no. 19, pages 5793 - 5796, XP002062742 |