Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8998159 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2015 | B2 | US2013206948 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201013178 | 05.08.2010 | GB201111009 | 28.06.2011 | WO2011GB01178 | 05.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2601363 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2016 | B1 | EP2601363 | 12.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201013178 | 05.08.2010 | GB201111009 | 28.06.2011 | WO2011GB01178 | 05.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2482524 | 08.02.2012 | A | GB201013178D0 | 22.09.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201013178 | 05.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2482581 | 29.08.2012 | B | GB2482581 | 08.02.2012 | A | GB201111009D0 | 10.08.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201013178 | 05.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012017212 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201013178 | 05.08.2010 | GB201111009 | 28.06.2011 |